+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 478-479
- Third consideration and final passage (186-11)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 239-241
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 503 PN 862, FP
March 11, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 503 PN 491, 2019 A61, KAUFFMAN
March 11, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 503 PN 491, 2019 A112, D. MILLER
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor