+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 23
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (197-1)
- Remarks see House Journal Page 455-456
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 502 PN 490, FINAL PASSAGE
April 8, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 502 PN 490, FP
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor