+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
May 26, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 490 PN 453, FP
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor