+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 9, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 26, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Vote
November 17, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 484 PN 542, FP
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor