+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (190-0)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On October 25, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On September 11, 2017 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
+ − Vote
April 10, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 480 PN 504, FP
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor