+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On December 20, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 3, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On November 4, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
- Reported with request to re-refer to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor