+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 13, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Remarks see House Journal Page 769-770
- In the Senate
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
May 12, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 475 PN 1197, FP
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor