+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On September 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1576-1577
- Third consideration and final passage (155-42)
- Re-reported as committed
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
+ − Vote
September 21, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 471 PN 516, FP
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor