+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
- In the House
- Veto No. 2
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1398-1406
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 821-828
- Third consideration and final passage (27-22)
- House concurred in Senate amendments (113-82)
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported as amended
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- First consideration
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 255-293
- Third consideration and final passage (114-87)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 242
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 521
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 466 PN 1985, CONCUR
June 30, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 466 PN 1985, FINAL PASSAGE
February 26, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 466 PN 521, FP
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor