+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On November 24, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On July 13, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage (196-0)
- In the Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
+ − Vote
April 22, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 455 PN 503, FP
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor