+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (178-16)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 9, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 454 PN 1549, FP
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor