+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On December 17, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2253-2254
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On December 11, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 10, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
December 17, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 452 PN 2823, FP
December 16, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 452 PN 2772, 2013 A4982, CALTAGIRONE
December 16, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 452 PN 2772, 2013 A5006, NEUMAN
December 16, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 452 PN 2772, 2013 A5007, NEUMAN
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor