+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 2, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 116
- Approved by the Governor
On October 25, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On September 28, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 7, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On October 27, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On September 18, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 496
- Third consideration and final passage (192-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 478-480
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
+ − Votes (3)
October 19, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 447 PN 1037, FINAL PASSAGE
April 15, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 447 PN 1037, FP
April 14, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 447 PN 1037, 2015 A448, SCHWEYER
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor