+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On December 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On November 21, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1881-1882
- Third consideration and final passage (191-0)
On October 17, 2017 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 16, 2017 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1632-1635
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 4, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 3, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
November 21, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 444 PN 2589, FP
October 16, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 444 PN 460, 2017 A3839, SUSP RULES, CALTAGIRONE
October 16, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 444 PN 460, 2017 A3839, CALTAGIRONE
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor