+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 303
- Third consideration and final passage (185-9)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
March 18, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 441 PN 427, FP
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor