+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 45
- Approved by the Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 546
- House concurred in Senate amendments
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
+ − Votes (7)
May 6, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 434 PN 3438, CONCUR
April 30, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: HB 434 PN 3438, FINAL PASSAGE
June 20, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 434 PN 2009, FP
June 19, 2013: House Rules Vote: House Bill 434 - Report Bill As Committed
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor