+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 640
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 568-569
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 17, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 432 PN 1516, FP
April 16, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 432 PN 1429, 2013 A807, ROZZI
April 16, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 432 PN 1429, 2013 A924, DERMODY
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor