+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 633-634
- Third consideration and final passage (105-90)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
April 30, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 430 PN 417, FP
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor