+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 48
- Approved by the Governor
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- House concurred in Senate amendments (198-1)
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 28, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 423 PN 2175, CONCUR
June 27, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 423 PN 2175, FINAL PASSAGE
May 8, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 423 PN 1327, FP
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor