+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On November 30, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On October 26, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor