+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 23, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 75
- Approved by the Governor
- Presented to the Governor
On October 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1827
- House concurred in Senate amendments
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On October 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On September 30, 2013 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On September 24, 2013 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On September 23, 2013 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
October 22, 2013: House Rules Vote: House Bill 421 - Report Bill As Committed
October 22, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 421 PN 2415, CONCUR
October 21, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: HB 421 PN 2415, FINAL PASSAGE
September 23, 2013: Senate Appropriations Vote: House Bill 421 - Re-Reported as Amended
March 19, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 421 PN 1125, FP
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor