+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 671
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 410 PN 1445, FP
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor