+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On December 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On November 18, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On November 13, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 12, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 23, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE