+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (194-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
+ − Vote
March 18, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 404 PN 380, FP
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor