+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2013: House Appropriations Vote: House Bill 404 - Re-report Bill As Committed
February 12, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 404 PN 583, FP
February 6, 2013: House Judiciary Vote: House Bill 404 - Adopt Amendment A00075
February 6, 2013: House Judiciary Vote: House Bill 404 - Report Bill As Amended
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor