+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (202-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1698
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 10, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 400 PN 3850, FP
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor