+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 15
- Approved by the Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
+ − Votes (5)
June 10, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: HB 40 PN 538, FINAL PASSAGE
March 20, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 40 PN 538, FP
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor