+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (189-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
+ − Vote
February 9, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 395 PN 432, FP
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor