+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 278
- Third consideration and final passage (190-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Vote
March 13, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 387 PN 371, FP
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor