+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
May 4, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 367 PN 1186, FP
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor