+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 26, 2022 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On October 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage (200-1)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
October 26, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 365 PN 3568, Final Passage
March 22, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 365 PN 337, FP
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor