+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 1, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 38
- Approved by the Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1012
- House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
- Amended on third consideration
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 940
- Third consideration and final passage (196-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 906-907
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
June 24, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 364 PN 4023, CONCUR
June 24, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 364 PN 4023, FINAL PASSAGE
June 4, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 364 PN 1974, FP
June 3, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 364 PN 1374, 2019 A1183, GABLER
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor