+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (194-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
April 21, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 363 PN 1196, FP
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor