+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 11
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in House
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Second consideration
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION