+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1498
- Third consideration and final passage (186-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
September 19, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 342 PN 1818, FP
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor