+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 6
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (190-3)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 341 PN 363, FINAL PASSAGE
April 15, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 341 PN 363, FP
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor