+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 405 - 406
- Third consideration and final passage (103-98)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 372 - 373
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
April 5, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 335 PN 310, FP
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor