+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On March 24, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor