+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 699-700
- Third consideration and final passage (125-67)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 655
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 332 PN 1677, FP
May 1, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 332 PN 310, 2019 A633, GROVE
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor