+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 12
- Approved by the Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 744-750
- Third consideration and final passage (26-24)
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1193-1204
- Third consideration and final passage (106-95)
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 406-422
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
June 26, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 33 PN 2182, FINAL PASSAGE
June 19, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 33 PN 2182, FP
March 27, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 33 PN 47, 2019 A543, KENYATTA
March 27, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 33 PN 47, 2019 A531, FIEDLER
March 27, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 33 PN 47, 2019 A533, FRANKEL
March 27, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 33 PN 47, 2019 A624, ULLMAN
March 27, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 33 PN 47, 2019 A535, DAWKINS
March 27, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 33 PN 47, 2019 A536, DELISSIO
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor