+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 20, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 88
- Approved by the Governor
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (193-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On July 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (188-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
+ − Votes (3)
July 13, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 325 PN 3084, CONCUR
July 12, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 325 PN 3084, FINAL PASSAGE
June 10, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 325 PN 1342, FP
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor