+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On October 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (198-2)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 6, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 5, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
October 7, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 323 PN 2275, FP
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor