+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 4, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 73
- Approved by the Governor
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On September 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On September 23, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 857-858
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 173
- Third consideration and final passage (174-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 164
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
September 23, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 318 PN 544, FINAL PASSAGE
February 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 318 PN 544, FP
February 19, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 318, 2019 A59, SUSP RULES, FARRY
February 19, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 318, 2019 A59, FARRY
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor