+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 21
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (196-1)
- Remarks see House Journal Page 478
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 315 PN 295, FINAL PASSAGE
April 9, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 315 PN 295, FP
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor