+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 44
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On September 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in House
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (47-0)
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (194-1)
- Remarks see House Journal Page 369
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
+ − Votes (2)
September 17, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 315 PN 322, FINAL PASSAGE
March 4, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 315 PN 322, FP
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor