+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 25, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 115
- Approved by the Governor
On November 20, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (202-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On November 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On November 17, 2020 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On September 21, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 529-530
- Third consideration and final passage (198-0)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
November 19, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 30 PN 3853, CONCUR
November 17, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 30 PN 3853, FINAL PASSAGE
April 15, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 30 PN 365, FP
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor