+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On October 21, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 6, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Remarks see House Journal Page 930-931
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 27, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 296 PN 269, FP
June 4, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 296 PN 269, 2019 A1576, D. MILLER
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor