+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1352
- Third consideration and final passage (142-58)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1352
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 27, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 295 PN 268, FP
June 26, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 295 PN 268, 2019 A2521, FRANKEL
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor