+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 459-461
- Third consideration and final passage (193-8)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 426-428
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 290 PN 1157, FP
April 6, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 290 PN 1049, 2021 A635, ROZZI
April 6, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 290 PN 1049, 2021 A637, ROZZI
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor