+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 289 PN 300, FP
March 19, 2013: House Judiciary Vote: House Bill 289 - Report Bill As Committed
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor